U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08267-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NOGUEIRA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order]
  • August 25, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Complaint]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.