U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08268-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CARRASCO HERNANDEZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 13, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 13, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.