U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09475-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NDIAYE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 17, 2021: [Order]
  • October 17, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.