U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09491-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HILL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.