U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10338-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 21, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 21, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.