U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09214-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NUNEZ, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 16, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [Plea Agreement Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 01, 2021: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.