U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-04025-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IANNCELLI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order]
  • October 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 28, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 19, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.