U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-07110-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GEHOUSKEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 06, 2023: [Miscellaneous Relief]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.