U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10372-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOYNER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff]
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 26, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.