U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-07113-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CRAIG
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.