U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS, et al.
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Letter]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • October 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.