U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-mj-05585-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LOPEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 12, 2022: [Letter]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Bond]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 12, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 04, 2022: [Release from Custody]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.