U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13382-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CORTES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Bond]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.