U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-06044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FAIRCLOTH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.