U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-06037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANTONIO DELANEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.