U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13388-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JUAN TORRENS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order of Dismissal]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 03, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 03, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.