U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15460-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Reassigning Case]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.