U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15446-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FIELDS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 28, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 28, 2022: [Arrest ]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.