U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13399-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MICHAEL STEWART
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.