U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-13404-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ANDINO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2023: [Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 20, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 30, 2022: [Appear]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 15, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 16, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 15, 2021: [~Util - Bond Set/Reset]
  • November 15, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.