U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09422-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HENRIQUES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.