U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15452-1
  • Case Name: USA v. COURNEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order of Dismissal]
  • October 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 31, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • July 27, 2022: [Trial Brief ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Pretrial Conference]
  • June 12, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • December 20, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • December 13, 2021: [Transcript]
  • December 07, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • December 06, 2021: [Add Counts]
  • December 02, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Reply to Response ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 12, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 10, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order to Seal Case]
  • November 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.