U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15440-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARCIA SARABIA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Docket Annotation (public)]
  • November 16, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • November 15, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Letter]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 10, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.