U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-03035-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BARRINGER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.