U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15464-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TORRES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 03, 2024: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 24, 2022: [Certification]
  • August 13, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Travel]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order]
  • February 19, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.