U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11325-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MANASSE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.