U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15471-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CODO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 15, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 16, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 16, 2021: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • November 16, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.