U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-02105-1
  • Case Name: USA v. EDWIN TORRES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.