U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08332-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERNANDEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 22, 2021: [Complaint]
  • November 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.