U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11338-1
  • Case Name: USA v. QUINONES-MARTINEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Docket Annotation (public)]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.