U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11356-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ISAAC
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 04, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 11, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • March 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Substitution of Attorney]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Seal Case]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.