U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MENA et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • July 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.