U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-02109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TARIQ D JETT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.