U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09506-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROGERS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
  • May 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order]
  • May 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 04, 2022: [Status Conference]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 13, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order]
  • April 07, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 20, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.