U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-08308-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORALES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 20, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 08, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.