U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11333-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VIDAL et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 15, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order]
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Bond]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 24, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.