U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11357-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ, et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 17, 2022: [Bond]
  • April 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 17, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Appointed]
  • April 04, 2022: [Bond]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • November 24, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order to Seal Case]
  • November 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.