U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09268-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCCLAURIN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Order]
  • June 06, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order]
  • March 28, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.