U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:20-mj-08102-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CASTILLO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 05, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • November 05, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 27, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 26, 2022: [Order]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 17, 2022: [Bond Hearing]
  • April 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.