U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-09519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOUAZIZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • December 01, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.