U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11371-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MALIK et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Transcript]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.