U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-mj-03041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RUCKER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 02, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.