U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10394-1
  • Case Name: USA v. YAGO et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.