U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10173-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DESHAWN COUSINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order]
  • September 08, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 20, 2022: [Order]
  • March 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order]
  • February 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 09, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.