U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15454-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DORSAINVIL et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.