U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11377-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROOKINS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 06, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.