U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10403-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RODRIGUEZ VELASQUEZ et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 07, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.