U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-15490-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARRIDO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order]
  • January 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2021: [Information - ALL Misdemeanor]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 07, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 07, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.