U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-10413-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KATZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [QC - Generic Message]
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Bond]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.