U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey

new jersey Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of New Jersey
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-mj-11316-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOYD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Substitution of Attorney]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Bond]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Examination or Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 09, 2021: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • December 09, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.